WebThe supervisory board has appointed co-director Pieter Wolleswinkel as CEO of ForFarmers, effective from 3 April 2024. In addition, the supervisory board has … WebFeb 3, 2024 · Lochem, 3 February 2024 ForFarmers nominates Marijke Folkers-In ‘t Hout as member of its Supervisory Board The Supervisory Board (‘the Board’) of ForFarmers N.V. (‘ForFarmers’) has ...
Board of Supervisors Meetings - Tulare County, California
WebApr 13, 2024 · KPMG Accountants N.V. has been appointed as auditor of ForFarmers to audit the 2024 financial statements and executive board report. The remuneration policy for the Supervisory Board was adopted with effect from financial year 2024 up to and including 2025. Mr W.M. Wunnekink was reappointed as a member of the Supervisory Board. WebMay 24, 2016 · Regulations Supervisory Board ForFarmers N.V. 01-10-2024 Regulations Audit Committee ForFarmers N.V. 25-10-2024 Regulations Remuneration Committee ForFarmers N.V. 25-10-2024 Regulations Selection- and Appointment Committee ForFarmers N.V. 25-10-2024 Rotation schedule of Supervisory Board Corporate … downtown berkeley inn
San Diego supervisors take no-confidence vote on Nathan …
Web23 hours ago · KPMG Accountants N.V. has been appointed as auditor of ForFarmers to audit the 2024 financial statements and executive board report. The remuneration policy … WebMar 11, 2024 · The Supervisory Board nominates Lochem, 11 March 2024 Changes in Supervisory Board of ForFarmers ForFarmers N.V. announces that Cees de Jong is not eligible for a new term as supervisory board member. WebApr 12, 2024 · ForFarmers CEO Theo Spierings has resigned from his position due to health reasons and personal circumstances and has consequently terminated his one-year contract prematurely. The supervisory board has appointed co-director Pieter Wolleswinkel as CEO of ForFarmers, effective April 3. “We sincerely regret that Theo is forced to … clean dark spread calculation